Global Patent Index - EP 1035066 A1

EP 1035066 A1 2000-09-13 - Flexible cover for elevator car to reduce noise caused by airflow

Title (en)

Flexible cover for elevator car to reduce noise caused by airflow

Title (de)

Flexible Aufzugkabinenhaube zur Verminderung von Strömungsgeräuschen

Title (fr)

Coiffe souple pour cabine d'ascenseur en vue de diminuer les bruits d'écoulement de l'air

Publication

EP 1035066 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102734 A

Priority

  • EP 00102734 A
  • EP 99810142 A

Abstract (en)

The hood for a lift car has a wall made from a flexible and foldable foil. In one of the design forms the shape and stability of the hood is ensured by a support structure(13) which comprises several rod-form elements conforming to the shape of the hood. Closable openings for the passage of people are made at one of more points in the flexible wall. Vertically extending recesses of suitable shape are formed in the region of the car guide rollers.

Abstract (de)

Eine Einrichtung zur Verminderung von Windgeräuschen an schnellfahrenden Aufzugkabinen besteht aus strömungstechnisch günstig geformten Hauben (1), die über dem Kabinendach (3) oder unter dem Kabinenboden (4) oder an beiden Positionen zugleich angebracht werden, wobei diese Hauben aus einer elastischen, membranartigen Folie bestehen. Die Stabilität der Hauben wird durch eine Stützkonstruktion aus stabförmigen Elementen oder durch in die membranartige Haubenwände eingearbeitete Luftkammern gewährleistet. Mit Reissverschluss verschliessbare Öffnungen (9) in den Haubenwänden ermöglichen die Evakuierung von Passagieren und den Zugang auf das Kabinendach und zur Kabinenunterseite. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0226 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 099, no. 004 30 April 1999 (1999-04-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 095, no. 002 31 March 1995 (1995-03-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035066 A1 20000913; EP 1035066 B1 20030910; AT 249392 T 20030915; CA 2298387 A1 20000817; CN 1099993 C 20030129; CN 1263863 A 20000823; DE 50003600 D1 20031016; HK 1031857 A1 20040121; MY 120378 A 20051031; SG 76644 A1 20001121; US 6318509 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-10-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003600

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010217

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI