Global Patent Index - EP 1035071 A1

EP 1035071 A1 2000-09-13 - Fuel dispensing system with shut off device upon detection of fuel flow in vapour recovery line

Title (en)

Fuel dispensing system with shut off device upon detection of fuel flow in vapour recovery line

Title (de)

Kraftstoffabgabevorrichtung mit Sperreinrichtung bei Anwesenheit von Flüssigkeit in der Gasrückführleitung

Title (fr)

Distributeur de carburant avec dispositif de coupure lors de la présence de liquide dans la conduite de récupération de vapeurs

Publication

EP 1035071 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00104016 A

Priority

IT FI990039 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel dispensing system (200) comprises means (100) for detecting fuel flowing in a vapour recovery line (102) and means (100) for preventing flow of the fuel detected, possibly by accumulated fuel closing a valve in the vapour recovery line, generation of an appropriate signal to the dispenser control, or some such other means. The invention prevents fraud (intentional or otherwise) which may occur if fuel metered by the dispenser, and charged to a customer, is subsequently returned via the vapour recovery line which may occur, for example, if the vapour recovery line is coaxial with the fuel delivery line and a seal fails in the couplings between the dispenser and nozzle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/04 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/0478 (2013.01); B67D 7/0488 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4687033 A 19870818 - FURROW ROGER W [US], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035071 A1 20000913; EP 1035071 B1 20021120; DE 60000797 D1 20030102; IT 1310013 B1 20020205; IT FI990039 A1 20000905; IT FI990039 D0 19990305

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050225

2004-10-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-03-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040304

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-02-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040210

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-05-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000797 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GILBARCO S.P.A.

2001-11-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY LI

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI