Global Patent Index - EP 1035106 A1

EP 1035106 A1 2000-09-13 - Process for the preparation of amines

Title (en)

Process for the preparation of amines

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Aminen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la préparation d'amines

Publication

EP 1035106 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102220 A

Priority

DE 19910960 A

Abstract (en)

Catalysts containing oxygen-containing compounds of zirconium (calculated as ZrO2), copper (as CuO), nickel (as NiO), optionally molybdenum (as MoO3) and optionally aluminum (as Al2O3) are used for the production of amines by reaction of aldehydes or ketones with ammonia or prim. or sec. amines and hydrogen. A process for the production of amines involves reacting aldehydes or ketones with ammonia or prim. or sec. amines and hydrogen at elevated temperature and pressure in presence of a copper-containing catalyst in which the active material contains (before reduction with hydrogen): (A) 20-85 wt.% zirconium-oxygen compounds (calculated as ZrO2), (B) 1-30 wt.% copper-oxygen compounds (as CuO), (C) 14-70 wt.% nickel-oxygen compounds (as NiO), (D) 0-5 wt.% molybdenum-oxygen compounds (as MoO3) and (E) 0-10 wt.% aluminum-oxygen compounds (as Al2O3).

Abstract (de)

Herstellung von Aminen durch Umsetzung von Aldehyden oder Ketonen bei erhöhter Temperatur und erhöhtem Druck mit Stickstoffverbindungen, ausgewählt aus der Gruppe Ammoniak, primäre und sekundäre Amine, und mit Wasserstoff in Gegenwart eines Katalysators enthaltend Kupfer, wobei die katalytisch aktive Masse des Katalysators vor der Reduktion mit Wasserstoff 20 bis 85 Gew.-% sauerstoffhaltige Verbindungen des Zirkoniums, berechnet als ZrO2, 1 bis 30 Gew.-% sauerstoffhaltige Verbindungen des Kupfers, berechnet als CuO, 14 bis 70 Gew.-% sauerstoffhaltige Verbindungen des Nickels, berechnet als NiO, 0 bis 5 Gew.-% sauerstoffhaltige Verbindungen des Molybdäns, berechnet als MoO3, und 0 bis 10 Gew.-% sauerstoffhaltige Verbindungen des Aluminiums, berechnet als Al2O3, enthält.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 209/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 23/88 (2006.01); B01J 37/03 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 209/26 (2006.01); C07C 211/06 (2006.01); C07C 211/07 (2006.01); C07C 211/27 (2006.01); C07C 211/30 (2006.01); C07C 211/35 (2006.01); C07C 211/38 (2006.01); C07C 211/42 (2006.01); C07C 213/02 (2006.01); C07C 217/58 (2006.01); B01J 23/885 (2006.01); C07C 211/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 209/26 (2013.01); C07C 213/02 (2013.01); B01J 23/885 (2013.01); B01J 37/03 (2013.01); C07C 2101/08 (2013.01); C07C 2102/10 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C07C 209/26 + C07C 211/06
  2. C07C 209/26 + C07C 211/07
  3. C07C 209/26 + C07C 211/17
  4. C07C 209/26 + C07C 211/27
  5. C07C 209/26 + C07C 211/30
  6. C07C 209/26 + C07C 211/35
  7. C07C 209/26 + C07C 211/38
  8. C07C 213/02 + C07C 217/58

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035106 A1 20000913; CN 1270161 A 20001018; DE 19910960 A1 20000914; JP 2000290237 A 20001017; US 6417353 B1 20020709

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI