Global Patent Index - EP 1035157 A1

EP 1035157 A1 2000-09-13 - HIGHLY CLEAN POROUS POLYVINYL ACETAL RESIN, METHOD FOR PREPARING THE SAME, AND METHOD FOR STORING THE SAME

Title (en)

HIGHLY CLEAN POROUS POLYVINYL ACETAL RESIN, METHOD FOR PREPARING THE SAME, AND METHOD FOR STORING THE SAME

Title (de)

HOCHREINES PORÖSES POLYVINYLACETATHARZ, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND DESSEN SPEICHERVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

RESINE D'ACETAL DE POLYVINYLE POREUSE ET D'UNE GRANDE PROPRETE, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET PROCEDE DE STOCKAGE DE CETTE RESINE

Publication

EP 1035157 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97913421 A

Priority

JP 9704249 W

Abstract (en)

A porous poly(vinyl acetal) resin body is made to have COD of 5 ppm or smaller, a conductivity of 5 mu S/cm or lower, and the number of particles having a size of 2.5 mu m or larger of 50,000/cc or smaller, as measures for the cleanliness. Using the porous poly(vinyl acetal) resin body having such a high degree of cleanliness in a cleaning process in a clean room or the like, one can reduce or eliminate a conventionally required pretreatment such as a thorough cleaning of the body to prevent elution of contaminants. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08J 9/00; B08B 1/00; A47L 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 1/00 (2006.01); C08F 8/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035157 A1 20000913; EP 1035157 A4 20010207; EP 1035157 B1 20060308; AU 5066398 A 19990615; DE 69735412 D1 20060504; DE 69735412 T2 20060810; WO 9927003 A1 19990603

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091121

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091121

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081013

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061211

2006-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69735412 P 20060504

2006-04-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IE

2006-03-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030502

2001-02-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001227

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE GB IE

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 08J 9/00 A, 7B 08B 1/00 B, 7A 47L 25/00 B, 7C 08F 8/28 B

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IE