Global patent index - EP 1035194 A2

EP 1035194 A2 2000-09-13 - Use of comb polymers as soil release polymers

Title (en)

Use of comb polymers as soil release polymers

Title (de)

Verwendung von Kammpolymeren als Schmutzablösepolymere

Title (fr)

Utilisations de polymères peignes comme polymères éliminant la saleté

Publication

EP 1035194 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102085 A

Priority

DE 19906367 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19906367A1] Soil release polymers are comb polymers (I) obtained by condensation of: (a) a polycarboxylic acid or polyol; (b) optionally sulfonated di-, tri- or tetrahydric polyol(s) or polyglycols; (c) optionally 2-10 carbon dicarboxylic acid(s); and (d) compound(s) selected from mono- or di-alkyl- or -aryl-amines, alcohols or phenols, carboxylic acids, glycols or (poly)ether glycols and sulfonated alcohols. Compound(s) (III) selected from mono- or di-alkyl- or -aryl-amines (IIIA, IIIB), alcohols or phenols (IIIC), carboxylic acids (IIID), glycols or (poly)ether glycols (IIIE) and sulfonated alcohols (IIIF) are comprised of formulae: HO-(XO)a-H (II) NH2R (IIIA) NHR2 (IIIB) ROH (IIIC) R<1>COOH (IIID) HO(XO)bH (IIIE) HO(CH2CH2)dSO3K (IIIF) X = C2H4 and/or C3H7; a = 2-35, preferably 2-5; b = 2-40, preferably 3-20; d = 1-10, preferably 1-4; K = a cation; R = 1-22C alkyl or 6-10C aryl; R<1> = 1-22C alkyl or sulfoalkyl, 6-10C aryl or sulfoaryl; An Independent claim is also included for the production of the oligoester (I).

Abstract (de)

Verwendung von Kammpolymeren, erhalten durch Kondensation von a) einer Polycarbonsäure oder einem Polyalkohol, b) einem oder mehreren gegebenenfalls durch Sulfogruppen substituierten Polyalkoholen mit 2 bis 4 OH-Gruppen oder Polyglykolen der Formel HO-(XO)a-H, worin X C2H4 und/oder C3H7 und a eine Zahl von 2 bis 35, vorzugsweise 2 bis 5 bedeutet, c) einer oder mehreren gegebenenfalls sulfonierten C2-C10-Dicarbonsäuren und d) einer oder mehreren Verbindungen der Formeln NH2R, NHR2, ROH, R<1>COOH, HO(XO)b-H, HO(CH2CH2)dSO3K worin R C1-C22-Alkyl oder C6-C10-Aryl, R<1> C1-C22-Alkyl, C1-C22-Sulfoalkyl, C6-C10-Aryl oder C6-C10-Sulfoaryl, X C2H4 und/oder C3H7, b eine Zahl von 3 bis 40, vorzugsweise 3 bis 20, d eine Zahl von 1 bis 10, vorzugsweise 1 bis 4 und K ein Kation bedeuten, als Schmutzlösepolymere.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 63/668 (2006.01); C08G 63/688 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); D06M 15/507 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0036 (2013.01); C11D 3/37 (2013.01); C11D 3/3746 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19906367 A1 20000817; EP 1035194 A2 20000913; EP 1035194 A3 20020102; EP 1035194 B1 20040915; ES 2228311 T3 20050416; JP 2000239365 A 20000905; JP 4731656 B2 20110727; US 6255274 B1 20010703

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151207

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-09-13 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCOW

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: PATENT MANAGEMENT INDUSTRIEPARK HOECHST / G 860, 65926 FRANKFURT AM MAIN (DE)

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20091201

2006-09-15 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2006-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-06-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2228311

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050127

2005-02-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050203

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007720

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI