Global Patent Index - EP 1035197 A1

EP 1035197 A1 2000-09-13 - Production process for detergent tablet

Title (en)

Production process for detergent tablet

Title (de)

Produktionsverfahren für Waschmitteltablette

Title (fr)

Procédé de production pour détergent comprimé

Publication

EP 1035197 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99870039 A

Priority

EP 99870039 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a process for making a detergent tablet, the process comprising a first step of providing a detergent composition, a second step of forming a particulate material comprising the detergent composition, and a third step of compressing the particulate material in a tablet form, the process being characterised in that it further comprises a step of cooling the detergent composition below ambient temperature between the first and the third step.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0091 (2013.01); C11D 17/0073 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

S.E. FRIBERG; M. CHIU, J. DISPERSION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, vol. 9, no. 5, 6, 1988, pages 443 - 457

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035197 A1 20000913; EP 1035197 B1 20020619; EP 1035197 B2 20100303; AR 022826 A1 20020904; AU 3612800 A 20000921; BR 0008775 A 20011226; CA 2362954 A1 20000908; CN 1425059 A 20030618; DE 69901873 D1 20020725; DE 69901873 T2 20030220; DE 69901873 T3 20100923; EP 1159394 A1 20011205; ES 2177212 T3 20021201; JP 2002538269 A 20021112; WO 0052129 A1 20000908

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130305

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130305

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69901873

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110305

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110331

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100614

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100304

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100308

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20100304

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100318

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100323

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100323

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-03-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20100303

2010-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2008-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

2008-07-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

2003-05-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2177212 T3

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901873 20020725

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-06-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011206

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010312

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI