Global patent index - EP 1035238 A1

EP 1035238 A1 2000-09-13 - Spinning device

Title (en)

Spinning device

Title (de)

Spinnvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de filage

Publication

EP 1035238 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103443 A

Priority

DE 19910437 A

Abstract (en)

A number of extruders (1.1 to 1.3) feed melt streams to metering pumps (4.1 to 4.3), each of which produces two streams that are fed to adjacent spinning positions (8.1,8.2) containing a number of spinnerets (9.1 to 9.6). Adjacent spinning positions are arranged so that the filament bundle (10.3) from one spinning position (8.1) can be combined with the filament bundle (10.4) from the other (8.2). A valve block (3) is placed between the extruders (1.1 to 1.3) and the pumps (4.1 to 4.3) with switching positions that allow each spinning position to be fed either from one or from several extruders. The wind-up installation (16) has a greater number of winding positions than there are spinning positions.

Abstract (de)

Es ist eine Spinnvorrichtung zur Herstellung mehrerer Fäden (15;24) beschrieben, bei welcher die Fäden durch Zusammenfassen mehrerer Filamentbündel (10) erzeugt werden. Hierzu weist die Spinnvorrichtung mehrere Extruder (1) zur Erzeugung mehrerer Schmelzeströme, die durch mehrere Verteilerpumpen (4) auf zumindest zwei nebeneinander angeordneten Spinnstellen (8) aufgeteilt werden, auf. Die Spinnstellen (8) weisen jeweils mehrere Spinndüsen (9) auf, welche einen Teilstrom einer Verteilerpumpe (4) zu einem Filamentbündel extrudiert. Erfindungsgemäß sind die Spinnstellen (8) mit ihren Spinndüsen (9) derart nebeneinander angeordnet, daß zumindest ein Filamentbündel (10.3) der einen Spinnstelle (8.1) mit zumindest einem Filamentbündel (10.4) der anderen Spinnstelle (8.2) zu einem Faden zusammenfaßbar sind, so daß die Vorrichtung geeignet ist, eine Anzahl Fäden herzustellen, die gleich der Anzahl der Spinnstellen ist oder die größer der Anzahl der Spinnstellen ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 1/06; D01D 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 1/06 (2006.01); D01D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/082 (2013.01); D01D 1/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035238 A1 20000913; EP 1035238 B1 20041020; US 6406650 B1 20020618

INPADOC legal status

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080228

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SAURER G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070321

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070321

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050721

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50008281

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE LI

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI