Global Patent Index - EP 1035242 A1

EP 1035242 A1 2000-09-13 - Sample warper

Title (en)

Sample warper

Title (de)

Kurzketten-Schärmaschine

Title (fr)

Ourdissoir d'échantillonnage

Publication

EP 1035242 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103680 A

Priority

DE 19910833 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19910833C1] The warping machine for short warps has a drum with at least one yarn guide operating on the feed plane at one end side. Axially parallel conveyor belts and part-rods are round the circumference to form leases and carry off the laid yarns in an axially parallel direction. The selection system has a selection lever (15), on a radial extension at the drum, to pivot on an axis (17) at the end of the part-rod (3). Its free end in the first position (A) is on one side of the feed plane (18), and on the other side of the plane in the second position. The swing axis (17) for the selection lever (15) lies on the feed plane (18). The selection lever (15) is one arm of a twin-arm lever (14), with its second arm (16) aligned into the rod and coupled (26) to the setting member (24) of an axial motor. The swing axis (17) of the lever (14) is offset from the axis of the setting member (24) towards the free end of the selection lever (15). A limit stop, which carries a damping cushion, prevents the second arm (16) reaching a dead point position. The second arm (16) of the lever (14) swings between the limit stop and an angled ramp (13), at the side of the selection lever (15) radially opposite the part-rod (3). The axial motor is a pneumatic piston/cylinder unit (22), supplied with compressed air through a control valve (30), close to the motor within the part-rod. The stroke volume of the pneumatic piston/cylinder unit (22) is <= 10 cm<2> and preferably <= 5 cm<2>. The rest times of the selection lever (15) are at least 80% of the cycle time, between two successive yarn guide passages. A number of yarn guides are used, with a cycle time of <= 60 ms.

Abstract (de)

Eine Kurzketten-Schärmaschine weist eine feststellbare Trommel, einen umlaufenden Fadenführer, Transportbänder und Teilstäbe (3) auf. Ein Selektionshebel (15) sorgt dafür, daß die gelegten Fäden wahlweise auf oder unter den Teilstab (3) plaziert werden. Der Selektionshebel (15) erstreckt sich etwa radial zur Trommel und ist um eine Achse (17) des Teilstabes schwenkbar. Die freien Enden des Selektionshebels (15) befinden sich in der ersten Stellung (A) auf der einen Seite der durch die Fadenführer vorgegebenen Zuführebene (18) und in der zweiten Stellung (B) auf der anderen Seite. Als Axialmotor kann eine pneumatische Kolben-Zylinder-Einheit (22) dienen, die über ein Steuerventil (30) mit Druckluft versorgt wird, das nahe der Einheit (22) im Teilstab (3) untergebracht ist. Eine solche Gestaltung erlaubt hohe Maschinengeschwindigkeiten bei sicherer Selektion der einzelnen Fäden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02H 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02H 9/02 (2006.01); D02H 3/00 (2006.01); D02H 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02H 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19910833 C1 20000531; DE 50004957 D1 20040212; EP 1035242 A1 20000913; EP 1035242 B1 20040107; ES 2208163 T3 20040616; JP 2000256931 A 20000919; JP 3418367 B2 20030623

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090223

2010-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090223

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080225

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2208163

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50004957

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE ES IT LI

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI