Global Patent Index - EP 1035246 A3

EP 1035246 A3 2000-10-04 - Program-controlled treatment apparatus for laundry

Title (en)

Program-controlled treatment apparatus for laundry

Title (de)

Programmgesteuertes Wäschepflegegerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de traitement du linge commandé par programme

Publication

EP 1035246 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00104924 A

Priority

DE 19910066 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1035246A2] The values are measured and/or deposited in the storage device of the appliance. The residual dampness can be displayed by the display unit (10) after the conclusion of a drying program. The display unit (10) is an acoustic or optical device. In the case of an optical device, the residual dampness is indicated through e.g. a light beam (11) or a digit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 35/00; D06F 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 35/00 (2006.01); D06F 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 35/007 (2013.01); D06F 39/005 (2013.01); D06F 2202/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035246 A2 20000913; EP 1035246 A3 20001004; DE 19910066 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030117

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020906

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI