Global Patent Index - EP 1035248 A2

EP 1035248 A2 2000-09-13 - Ink composition for ink jet textile printing

Title (en)

Ink composition for ink jet textile printing

Title (de)

Tintenzusammensetzung für Tintenstrahldruckverfahren von Textilien

Title (fr)

Composition d'encre pour procédé d'impression par jet d'encre de textiles

Publication

EP 1035248 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00105080 A

Priority

JP 6716199 A

Abstract (en)

Disclosed are ink compositions for ink jet textile printing, comprising at least an acid dye, a surfactant, water, and at least one compound represented by formula (I), the ink composition having a viscosity of not more than 8.0 m·Pa·s (20°C), is printed on a woven fabric by means of a piezoelectric vibrator type ink jet recording head: wherein EP1, EP2, and EP3 each independently represent an ethyleneoxy or propyleneoxy group; and l, m, and n each are independently 0 or a natural number of 1 or more, provided that at least one of l, m, and n is 1 or more with the average of l + m + n in the whole compound represented by formula (I) contained in the ink composition being 1 to 30.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06P 5/30; D06P 1/39; D06P 1/613; D06P 1/651

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06P 1/39 (2006.01); D06P 1/613 (2006.01); D06P 1/651 (2006.01); D06P 5/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06P 5/30 (2013.01); D06P 1/39 (2013.01); D06P 1/6133 (2013.01); D06P 1/65118 (2013.01); D06P 1/65131 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035248 A2 20000913; EP 1035248 A3 20060301

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20161001

2007-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070731

2006-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI