Global Patent Index - EP 1035251 A1

EP 1035251 A1 2000-09-13 - Dewatering band for paper machines

Title (en)

Dewatering band for paper machines

Title (de)

Entwässerungsband für Papiermaschinen

Title (fr)

Bande de séchage pour machines à papier

Publication

EP 1035251 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99104963 A

Priority

EP 99104963 A

Abstract (en)

The continuous blanket (1) for a papermaking machine, where water is extracted from the pulp, is composed of a number of lateral plate-shaped bodies (2) linked together by flexible strands (9) which lie along the length of the belt (1). The strand ends are anchored in end pieces (5,6), which are coupled together to form the continuous blanket (1). The end pieces are end bars (5,6), extending over the whole width of the blanket (1). The connecting strands (9) extend over the whole length of the blanket. Each flat body (2) has at least two connecting strands (9) through it. The bodies (2) are in lateral rows, offset against each other, so that the connecting strands pass through the offset bodies (2) in neighboring lateral rows. The bodies (2) have geometric shapes, fitting together as a jigsaw puzzle, as polygons and especially hexagons. They can also have a cross shape. The bodies can be flat rods, assembled to form lateral rows in the blanket with an offset so that the gaps in one row are bridged by the adjacent row. The bodies are strung loosely on the connecting strands, or they are bonded to them by adhesion or pressure. The bodies can have bending hinges, laterally across the blanket. The blanket end pieces (5,6) have eyelet passage channels to take a coupling wire (12) through them when they are in alignment. The end pieces (5,6) have passage openings where water can flow through. The end pieces and/or bodies form two complementary half-sections which are joined together, held by the connecting strands. Each half-section has half-channels on their facing sides to form passages for the connecting strands. The half-sections have couplings for an interlock, or they are bonded together by hot sealing or an adhesive.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Entwässerungsband (1), insbesondere als Trockensieb für Papiermaschinen, welche aus einer Vielzahl von plättchenförmigen Flachkörpern (2) zusammengesetzt ist, die zur Einstellung der Durchlässigkeit Durchgangsöffnungen aufweisen und/oder zwischen sich Lücken freilassen, wobei die Flachkörper über biegsame Verbindungsstränge (9), die die Flachkörper durchdringen, untereinander derart gekuppelt sind, daß die im Betrieb auf das Entwässerungsband wirkenden Längskräfte auf sie einwirken. Das Entwässerungsband ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Verbindungsstränge sich in Längsrichtung des Entwässerungsbands erstrecken und mit ihren Enden in Endstücken (5,6) verankert sind, welche miteinander kuppelbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/0027 (2013.01); D21F 1/0063 (2013.01); Y10S 162/90 (2013.01); Y10S 162/901 (2013.01); Y10S 162/902 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24273 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24322 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24479 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249922 (2015.04); Y10T 442/155 (2015.04); Y10T 442/172 (2015.04); Y10T 442/2025 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035251 A1 20000913; EP 1035251 B1 20020109; AT 211785 T 20020115; BR 0001274 A 20001010; BR 0001274 B1 20090113; CA 2300590 A1 20000912; CA 2300590 C 20050111; CN 1102185 C 20030226; CN 1266924 A 20000920; DE 59900740 D1 20020228; ES 2168817 T3 20020616; KR 100368679 B1 20030124; MY 125513 A 20060830; PL 190527 B1 20051230; PL 338849 A1 20000925; PT 1035251 E 20020628; TR 200000698 A2 20001023; TR 200000698 A3 20001023; TW 548363 B 20030821; US 6402895 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150313

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160426

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130312

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130312

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110312

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110312

2011-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110912

2011-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-10-19 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THOMAS JOSEF *HEIMBACH G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-09-16 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110912

2010-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100323

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100331

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100310

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-06-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2168817

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020406

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900740

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-28

2002-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 211785

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991211

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI