Global patent index - EP 1035266 A1

EP 1035266 A1 2000-09-13 - Device for securing roofing tiles

Title (en)

Device for securing roofing tiles

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Sturmsicherung von Platten zur Dacheindeckung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation de tuiles de toiture

Publication

EP 1035266 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99104955 A

Priority

EP 99104955 A

Abstract (en)

The roof tiles (1 - 3) are placed by their upper edge on a roof batten (8) directed across the fall line of the roof and have a bead on one side and a hook on the other. Elastically bending rod-like side fold clips (6) have hooks (7) at both ends to engage over the beads and in the area between the hooks have clamping or fastening means for clamping or fastening on the roof batten on which the upper end of the tile of the lower row is placed.

Abstract (de)

Um eine Anordnung zur Sturmsicherung von Platten zur Dacheindeckung, wobei die Platten (1-3) mit ihrer oberen Randkante auf eine Dachlatte (8) aufgelegt und seitlich miteinander verhakt sind, ferner die unteren Randkanten der in Fallrichtung des Daches auf eine verlegte Reihe von Platten (1,2) folgenden oberen Reihe von Platten (3) die oberen Randkanten der Platten (1,2) der unteren Reihe überdecken und verhakend übergreifen, wobei Seitenfalzklammern (6) mit Haken an den Platten befestigt sind, die einfach zu verlegen ist, wird vorgesschlagen, daß die Seitenfalzklammer (6) im zwischen den Haken (7) befindlichen Bereich ein Klemmittel (30) aufweist, mittels dessen sie an die Dachlatte (8) anklemmbar ist, auf der das obere Ende der Platte (1 oder 2) der unteren Reihe von Platten (1,2) aufgelegt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/34 (2006.01); E04D 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 12/004 (2013.01); E04D 1/34 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3411 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3461 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3482 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3485 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035266 A1 20000913

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040927

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030627

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI