Global Patent Index - EP 1035267 A3

EP 1035267 A3 2001-12-12 - Girder element for a fire-resistant roof

Title (en)

Girder element for a fire-resistant roof

Title (de)

Träger als Element eines feuerwiderstandsfähigen Daches

Title (fr)

Elément de support pour un toit résistant au feu

Publication

EP 1035267 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00104206 A

Priority

DE 19910423 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1035267A2] Several support elements make up a framework for supporting fire-resistant glass panes or other filler panels (1) with the interposition of a profiled seal (6) encased by a U-shaped profile element (5) of fire-resistant material. The space between the base of the profiled element and the profiled seal is filled up by a heat-resistant intumescent mass (7). the upper and lower supports (2, 3) are connected by to the filler panels by separate screws (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 3/08; E04B 1/94; E06B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/08 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0818 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0831 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] EP 0709540 A2 19960501 - EBERSPAECHER J [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035267 A2 20000913; EP 1035267 A3 20011212; DE 19910423 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: J. EBERSPAECHER GMBH & CO. KG

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI