Global Patent Index - EP 1035271 A1

EP 1035271 A1 2000-09-13 - Quick erecting shed roof

Title (en)

Quick erecting shed roof

Title (de)

Schnell-Montage-Hallendach

Title (fr)

Toiture de halle à montage rapide

Publication

EP 1035271 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99104906 A

Priority

EP 99104906 A

Abstract (en)

The roof (10) has roof trusses (50) mounted by bearings (20) on a support structure (12). The support bearings have a first bearing unit attached directly to the truss to allow it during assembly to turn about a first axis parallel to the longitudinal direction of the truss. The second bearing unit mounted on the first rotates about a second rotary axis perpendicular to the truss plane and a third bearing unit mounted on the second can rotate about a rotary axis parallel in the truss plane and perpendicular to the second rotary axis.

Abstract (de)

Ein Schnell-Montage-Hallendach (10) mit über Auflagereinrichtungen (20) auf einer Unterkonstruktion (12) gelagerten Dachbindern (50) mit einer Binderebene und einer Binderlängsrichtung und einer an die Binder (50) angeschlossenen Dachhaut (42) zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass die Auflagereinrichtung (20) so ausgebildet ist, dass zumindest während der Montage eines Binders drei Rotationsfreiheitsgrade (D1,D2,D3) möglich sind, insbesondere dass die Auflagereinrichtung (20) folgende Auflagereinheiten aufweist: eine erste Auflagereinheit (22.1), die direkt an den Dachbinder (50) angeschlossen ist und die während der Montage eine Drehung des Dachbinders (50) um eine erste Achse erlaubt (24.1), die parallel zur Längsrichtung des Binders (50) angeordnet ist, eine zweite Auflagereinheit (22.2), auf der die erste Auflagereinheit (22.1) gelagert ist, derart, dass die zweite Auflagereinheit (22.2) um eine zweite Drehachse (24.2) drehbar ist, die senkrecht zur Binderebene verläuft, und eine dritte Auflagereinheit (22.3), auf der die zweite Auflagereinheit (22.2) gelagert ist, derart, dass die dritte Auflagereinheit (22.3) um eine Drehachse (24.3) drehbar ist, die parallel, insbesondere in der Binderebene, und senkrecht zur zweiten Drehachse (24.2) angeordnet ist, und die auf der Unterkonstruktion (12) direkt oder indirekt gelagert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 1/26; E04G 21/28; E04H 15/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 5/12 (2006.01); E04G 21/28 (2006.01); E04H 15/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/18 (2013.01); E04B 7/022 (2013.01); E04G 5/12 (2013.01); E04G 21/28 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035271 A1 20000913; EP 1035271 B1 20050810; AT 301751 T 20050815; DE 59912391 D1 20050915; ES 2246548 T3 20060216

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-07-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060511

2006-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2246548 T3

2005-12-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2005-11-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-10-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2005-09-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912391 P 20050915

2005-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2005-08-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040415

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI