Global Patent Index - EP 1035277 A1

EP 1035277 A1 2000-09-13 - Lock case for door locks and door lock comprising such a lock case

Title (en)

Lock case for door locks and door lock comprising such a lock case

Title (de)

Schlosskasten für Türschlösser sowie Türschloss mit einem solchen Schlosskasten

Title (fr)

Boîte de serrure de porte et serrure de porte comportant une telle boîte de serrure

Publication

EP 1035277 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102904 A

Priority

  • DE 29903906 U
  • DE 29904930 U

Abstract (en)

The lock case, for a door lock, has a base (1) which is at least partially a metal die cast component. The cover is a stamped and/or bent steel plate. The components of the lock, such as at least one sliding and/or mounting unit (26), are of a different material from the casing base (1) and are fitted to the base by shaping or fittings, which are part of the one-piece molded casing base structure. At least one rim gear (25) or a ring (24) with teeth (25') is fitted to the base for the lock operation, which can be during the die casting of the casing base (1).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Schloßkasten für Türschlösser, der aus einem Schloßkastenboden und aus einem am Schloßkastenboden befestigten Deckel besteht und bei dem zwischen dem Boden und den Deckel ein Innenraum zur Aufnahme von Funktionselementen des Schlosses gebildet ist, ist der Schloßkastenboden zusammen mit einigen Funktionselementen, beispielsweise Befestigungs- und Führungsstiften als Metall-Druckgußteil gefertigt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05B 53/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/023 (2013.01); E05B 9/00 (2013.01); E05B 53/008 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035277 A1 20000913; TR 200000609 A2 20001023; TR 200000609 A3 20001023

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020906

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011213

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI