Global Patent Index - EP 1035280 A1

EP 1035280 A1 2000-09-13 - Lock for a door of a motor vehicle

Title (en)

Lock for a door of a motor vehicle

Title (de)

Schloss für eine Kraftfahrzeugtür

Title (fr)

Serrure pour porte de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1035280 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00104972 A

Priority

IT TO990195 A

Abstract (en)

Electrically operated lock (4) for a door of a motor vehicle, provided with a locking unit (7), an operating unit (8) connectable to corresponding manual operating members (5, 22) associated with the door (3) and capable of interacting with the locking unit (7) to cause it to open, first and second disabling means (70, 37) which can be activated selectively to disable the opening of the locking unit (7) from the inside and from the outside of the motor vehicle respectively, and an electrical actuator (58) having an output member (60) movable from a rest position along a first path (S) to cause the opening of the locking unit (7), and along a second path (T), different from the first path (S), to selectively activate the first blocking means (70). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00; E05B 65/12; E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 77/28 (2013.01); E05B 81/16 (2013.01); E05B 81/54 (2013.01); E05B 81/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035280 A1 20000913; EP 1035280 B1 20050601; BR 0002051 A 20010116; DE 60020427 D1 20050707; DE 60020427 T2 20060427; IT 1308430 B1 20011217; IT TO990195 A1 20000912; PL 338912 A1 20000925

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140309

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140309

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60020427

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140309

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60020427

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130325

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130306

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130306

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050912

2005-07-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60020427 P 20050707

2005-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-06-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031027

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTIER AUTOMOTIVE CLOSURES S.P.A

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010305

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI