Global Patent Index - EP 1035281 A1

EP 1035281 A1 2000-09-13 - Locking system for a door of a motor vehicle

Title (en)

Locking system for a door of a motor vehicle

Title (de)

Verriegelungssystem für eine Kraftfahrzeugtür

Title (fr)

Système de verrouillage pour porte de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1035281 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00104973 A

Priority

IT TO990192 A

Abstract (en)

Locking system (1) for a door (3) of a motor vehicle, comprising a lock (4) provided with a locking unit (7), an operating unit (8) capable of interacting with the locking unit (7) to cause it to open, a safety lever (37) which can be placed in a first and a second position for blocking and enabling, respectively, the opening of the locking unit (7) from the outside, a first electrical actuator (58) having an output member (60) movable along a first path (S) to cause the opening of the locking unit (7) independently of the position assumed by the safety lever (37), and a second electrical actuator (39) for moving the safety lever (37) between the blocking and enabling positions; the system (1) is also provided with a control unit (2) comprising user recognition means (100) which can be activated selectively to generate a signal to permit opening in the presence of a user authorized to open the lock (4) from the outside in the condition in which the safety lever (37) is in the blocking position, and first and second driving means (99, 104) generating corresponding operating signals (C1, C2) for the first and the second actuator (58, 39) respectively in response to the signal enabling opening from the user recognition means (100); the operating signal (C2) is generated after the operating signal (C1) and following the opening of the locking unit (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00; E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 77/28 (2013.01); E05B 81/16 (2013.01); E05B 81/54 (2013.01); E05B 81/78 (2013.01); E05B 81/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035281 A1 20000913; EP 1035281 B1 20040519; BR 0002050 A 20001031; DE 60010781 D1 20040624; DE 60010781 T2 20050616; ES 2220276 T3 20041216; IT 1308427 B1 20011217; IT TO990192 A1 20000912; PL 338875 A1 20000925

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60010781

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60010781

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130306

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050309

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-03-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-03-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050309

2005-03-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050309

2005-02-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2220276 T3

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60010781 P 20040624

2004-06-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: INTIER AUTOMOTIVE EYBL (GERMANY) GMBH

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTIER AUTOMOTIVE CLOSURES S.P.A

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-01-31 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI