Global Patent Index - EP 1035285 A1

EP 1035285 A1 2000-09-13 - Lock system for cabinets

Title (en)

Lock system for cabinets

Title (de)

Schrankschliesssystem

Title (fr)

Système de verrouillage pour armoires

Publication

EP 1035285 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99106993 A

Priority

CH 40999 A

Abstract (en)

The aim of the invention is to provide a cabinet system for use in production facilities and workshops which has means of ensuring that only authorised persons have access to drawers or other cabinet compartments. These security measures should not essentially impair the operating sequences. To this end, the inventive cabinet-closing system comprises at least one cabinet (1, 101) which has several compartments, preferably pull-out drawers (3), that are separate from each other and are arranged on a housing (2) of the cabinet. Compartments of the cabinet can be locked and unlocked by means of a locking device, each of the compartments being provided with a designated switchable catch (8, 108). The cabinet closing system is also provided with an access authorisation device into which identification codes can be entered and an electronic processing unit which is connected to the access authorisation device and the locking device so that the catch (8, 108) of the at least one compartment to which the identification code that has been entered is allocated in the electronic processing unit can be switched, each compartment being separately lockable/unlockable with its catch (8, 108).

Abstract (de)

Um für den Fertigungs- und Werkstattbereich ein Schranksystem zur Verfügung zu stellen, bei dem sichergestellt werden kann, dass nur berechtigte Personen auf Schubladen oder sonstige Schrankabteile Zugriff haben und trotz dieser Sicherheitsmassnahmen die Arbeitsabläufe im wesentlichen nicht beeinträchtigt werden, wird erfindungsegemäss ein Schrankschliesssystem vorgeschlagen, das zumindest einen Schrank (1, 101) umfasst, wobei der zumindest eine Schrank mehrere, voneinander abgetrennte Abteile, vorzugsweise ausziehbare Schubladen (3), aufweist, die an einem Gehäuse (2) des Schrankes angeordnet sind, Abteile des Schranks durch eine Verschlusseinrichtung ver- und entriegelbar sind, wozu jedes dieser Abteile mit einer ihm zugeordneten schaltbaren Sperre (8, 108) versehen ist, bei dem Schrankschliesssystem ferner eine Zugangsberechtigungseinrichtung vorgesehen ist, in die Identifikations-Codes eingebbar sind, zudem eine elektronische Verarbeitungseinheit vorhanden ist, die mit der Zugangsberechtigungseinrichtung und der Verschlusseinrichtung verbunden ist, wodurch die Sperre (8, 108) des dem eingegebenen Identifikations-Code in der elektronischen Verarbeitungseinheit zugewiesenen zumindest einen Abteil schaltbar ist, und hierbei jedes Abteil mit seiner Sperre (8, 108) separat ver- und entriegelbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/46 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/462 (2013.01); E05B 47/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035285 A1 20000913; US 6726294 B1 20040427; WO 0053871 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091103

2009-11-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032804

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040220

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LISTA EUROPE HOLDING AG

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010301

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI