Global Patent Index - EP 1035287 A2

EP 1035287 A2 2000-09-13 - Multi-panel sliding partition

Title (en)

Multi-panel sliding partition

Title (de)

Schiebewand mit mehreren Panelen

Title (fr)

Paroi coulissante à panneaux multiples

Publication

EP 1035287 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00500033 A

Priority

ES 9900462 A

Abstract (en)

Sliding leaf door, comprising two or more independent leaves, each of which is suspended from trucks (2) which move along independent rails (3) with a general C-shaped cross section. The lower lateral segment (4) of the rail defines a rolling track on which rests and travels a wheel (6) of trucks (2). The upper lateral segment (5) internally defines an inverted groove (7) which houses vertical shaft wheels (8) of trucks (2). Segments (4, 5) have an external longitudinal groove (9) to receive alignment and junction rules (10) between consecutive rails. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/06; E05D 15/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/0608 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/142 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/516 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035287 A2 20000913; EP 1035287 A3 20050727; EP 1035287 B1 20080123; AT 384845 T 20080215; CY 1107414 T1 20121219; DE 60037845 D1 20080313; DE 60037845 T2 20090129; DK 1035287 T3 20080602; ES 2178512 A1 20021216; ES 2178512 B1 20040916; ES 2300251 T3 20080616; PT 1035287 E 20080422

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170303

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170105

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170310

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170301

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170320

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170314

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170313

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080302

2008-12-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081024

2008-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-07-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: KLEIN IBERICA, S.A.

- Effective date: 20080507

2008-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2300251 T3

2008-06-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2008-05-21 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080401112

2008-05-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-05-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KLEIN IBERICA, S.A.

2008-04-29 [REG PT TE4A] CHANGE OF ADDRESS (PATENT)

- Owner name: KLEIN IBERICA, S.A., ES

- Effective date: 20080414

2008-04-22 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20080410

2008-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60037845 P 20080313

2008-03-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2008-01-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-01-16 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20060131

- Countries: AL

2008-01-16 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20060131

- Countries: LT

2008-01-16 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20060131

- Countries: LV

2008-01-16 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20060131

- Countries: RO

2008-01-16 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20060131

- Countries: MK

2008-01-16 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20060131

- Countries: SI

2008-01-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060419

2006-05-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2006-04-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-07-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI