Global patent index - EP 1035288 A1

EP 1035288 A1 2000-09-13 - Section member

Title (en)

Section member

Title (de)

Profilleiste

Title (fr)

Profilé

Publication

EP 1035288 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00104239 A

Priority

  • DE 29904160 U
  • DE 19917700 A
  • DE 19923309 A

Abstract (en)

The profiled bar (6,7) has a part-profile (8,12,15) placed between masonry (2) and a building component (1). The profiled bar has a holder profile (8) placed against the building component, and a profiled edging piece (9) held in place by the holder profile for joining with the masonry plaster layer (4,5). The holder profile has a first profiled arm (10) placed against the building component preferably by means of a flexible intermediate layer (11). From one end of the first arm a second profiled arm(12) extends at an angle of preferably 90 degrees.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Profilleiste (6,7) zur randseitigen Stoßanbindung einer Mauerputzschicht (4,5) an ein Bauteil (1), wie an einen Fensterrahmen (1), einen Türrahmen, eine Rolladenschiene oder dergleichen. Gemäß der Erfindung ist ein sich zwischen Mauerwerk (2) und Bauteil (1) anzuordnendes Teilprofil (12,15,16) der Profilleiste für die Anbringung der Profilleiste an dem Bauteil (1) vorgesehen. Alternativ ist wenigstens ein Teil der Profilleiste einstückig an das Bauteil angeformt. Durch diese Erfindungslösung wird die Anbringung von die Stoßanbindung des Mauerputzes an das Bauteil sichernder Profilleisten wesentlich erleichtert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/62; E04F 13/06; E04G 21/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/06 (2006.01); E04G 21/30 (2006.01); E06B 1/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 21/30 (2013.01); E04F 13/06 (2013.01); E06B 1/62 (2013.01); E04F 2013/063 (2013.01); E06B 2001/624 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035288 A1 20000913

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040224

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010313

2000-10-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LORENTZ, DORIS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRAUN, AUGUST

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI