Global patent index - EP 1035293 A1

EP 1035293 A1 2000-09-13 - Door or window frame

Title (en)

Door or window frame

Title (de)

Fenster- oder Türzarge

Title (fr)

Bâti dormant pour portes et fenêtres

Publication

EP 1035293 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00105065 A

Priority

LU 90370 A

Abstract (en)

The frame for a door or window has the cross member (3) connected to the uprights (1) by locking tongues (9) which engage in corresponding grooves (10) in the joint faces. At least one of the tongues has two incisions (13) in its base so that the tongue deforms around its axis so that the edges of the incisions engage the edges of the groove (10).

Abstract (fr)

Un bâti dormant métallique pour portes ou fenêtres comprend deux montants (1) et (2) et au moins une traverse (3). A chacune des deux extrémités de la traverse (3) est connectée une extrémité d'un des deux montants (1 ou 2) par des tenons de verrouillage (9) qui s'engagent dans des fentes (10) correspondantes de l'extrémité contiguë où ils sont bloqués. Les extrémités à assembler sont coupées à 45° de façon à former un raccord biseauté (8) entre chacun des montants (1 et 2) et la traverse (3). Une pièce de maintien (12) est fixée au niveau de chaque raccord biseauté (8) de façon à immobiliser le bord oblique de l'extrémité de la traverse (3) fermement contre le bord oblique (8) correspondant de l'extrémité contiguë du montant respectif (1ou 2), et à maintenir ainsi le montants (1 et 2) respectif à angle droit par rapport à la traverse (3), avant de bloquer lesdits tenons (9) dans leurs fentes correspondantes (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/988 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/9885 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035293 A1 20000913; EP 1035293 B1 20041006; AT 278864 T 20041015; DE 60014472 D1 20041111; DE 60014472 T2 20050915; LU 90370 A1 20000911

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060120

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080116

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080115

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080118

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-06-25 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20080118

2008-06-25 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Effective date: 20080118

2008-06-25 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080115

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080325

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080115

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070115

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2008-01-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HEINEN S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2008-01-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2008-01-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NCS UNIVERSAL RIGHTS B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050306

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: S.A. HEINENRUE DERRIèRE-L'EAU 11, B-4960 MALMEDY

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20050620

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: S.A. HEINENRUE DERRIèRE-L'EAU 11, B-4960 MALMEDY

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20070130

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: S.A. HEINENRUE DERRIèRE-L'EAU 11, B-4960 MALMEDY

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20050620

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: S.A. HEINENRUE DERRIèRE-L'EAU 11, B-4960 MALMEDY

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20070130

2007-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NCS UNIVERSAL RIGHTS B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2007-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: HEINEN S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2007-06-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MULTIMET S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2007-03-27 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-24 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070124

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070119

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070116

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070115

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-09 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2006-06-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2006-03-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: NOVOFERM GMBH

- Effective date: 20050706

2006-03-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2006-02-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MULTIMED S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2006-01-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: NOVOFERM GMBH

- Effective date: 20050706

2005-06-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: S.A. *MULTIMET49 BOULEVARD PRINCE HENRI, L-1724 LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20050620

2005-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2005-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-10 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050110

2005-01-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-01-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050106

2005-01-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050106

2005-01-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050106

2004-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60014472

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030714

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010203

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI