Global Patent Index - EP 1035305 A1

EP 1035305 A1 2000-09-13 - Tubing end-piece for a catalytic converter

Title (en)

Tubing end-piece for a catalytic converter

Title (de)

Endstück für einen Katalysator

Title (fr)

Embout pour un catalyseur

Publication

EP 1035305 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00104692 A

Priority

DE 19910020 A

Abstract (en)

The endpiece comprises an outer shell(20) which tapers between an outer periphery and inner periphery, and which in the region of the inner periphery forms a flat flange contact face(17). The outer shell is dome-shaped or dish-shaped in construction, whereby the flat flange contact face forms the base of the dome or dish. An insulation(22) is provided between the inner(18) and outer shells. The inner and outer shells, at least in the region of the inner periphery, are interconnected by means of inert gas welding.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Katalysator-Anordnung mit einem Katalysator und einem Abgasrohr (16) sowie einem zwischen dem Katalysator und dem Abgasrohr vorgesehenen Endstück (10), das auf einer Seite eine große Öffnung (12) zum Anschluß an den Katalysator und auf der anderen Seite eine kleine Öffnung (14) zum Anschluß an das Abgasrohr (16) aufweist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/28; F01N 7/08; F01N 7/14; F01N 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F01N 13/08 (2010.01); F01N 13/14 (2010.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/1855 (2013.01); F01N 3/28 (2013.01); F01N 13/08 (2013.01); F01N 13/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5408828 A 19950425 - KREUCHER JOHN E [US], et al
  • [A] US 4352783 A 19821005 - BAILEY CHARLES H
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 11 29 November 1996 (1996-11-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 044 (M - 455) 21 February 1986 (1986-02-21)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035305 A1 20000913; DE 19910020 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030926

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010302

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI