Global Patent Index - EP 1035308 A1

EP 1035308 A1 2000-09-13 - Self-propelled harvesting machine

Title (en)

Self-propelled harvesting machine

Title (de)

Selbstfahrende Erntemaschine

Title (fr)

Moissonneuse automotrice

Publication

EP 1035308 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99104707 A

Priority

  • EP 99104707 A
  • US 29243999 A

Abstract (en)

The drive for the cooling air cleaner is energized in dependence upon the measured value of a sensor(22,24). The suction casing(8) and/or cover plate(13) by switching of the suction device is rotatable by gravity force or by a motorized control into a position covering an area allocated to the lower section of the filter unit(7). The suction casing in a section running in the direction of the rotational axis is angular in design and facing the rotational axis is rectangular.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine selbstfahrende Erntemaschine mit einem Antriebsmotor, einem Kühler und einem Kühlventilator, dem eine Kühlluft-Reinigungseinrichtung mit einem Filter zum Zurückhalten der Schmutzpartikel in der angesaugten Kühlluft vorgeordnet ist mit einer Absaugvorrichtung zur Entfernung von angesaugten Schmutzpartikeln, und die Kühlluft-Reinigungseinrichtung mittels eines schaltbaren Antriebs antreibbar ist. Erfindungsgemäß neu ist, daß der Antrieb 14 abhängig vom Meßwert eines Sensors 22, 24 schaltbar ist. Eine weitere alternative Lösung ist, daß das Absauggehäuse 8 und /oder das Abschirmblech 13 bei Abschalten der Absaugvorrichtung durch schwerkraft oder eine motorische Steuerung in eine dem unteren Teil der Filtereinrichtung 7 zugeordneten Bereich abdeckende Stellung drehbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0079399 A1 19830525 - DEERE & CO [US]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035308 A1 20000913; EP 1035308 B1 20040714; US 6193772 B1 20010227

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160310

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160310

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-21 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59909954

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909954 P 20040819

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021213

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010313

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI