Global Patent Index - EP 1035312 A3

EP 1035312 A3 2001-03-07 - Throttle body for controlling the power of an engine

Title (en)

Throttle body for controlling the power of an engine

Title (de)

Drosselklappenstutzen zum Steuern der Leistung einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Corps de papillon pour commander la puissance d'un moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 1035312 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99123628 A

Priority

DE 19909982 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1035312A2] The throttle flap support (2) has a recess (50) in one endface of the throttle flap (6), projecting into the circumference (26) of the flap, so that the free throttle cross section in the region of the closed position of the throttle cap can be controlled with great sensitivity. The gas channel wall (18) has a narrowing sector (20) in the vicinity of the flap circumference.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/1045 (2013.01); F02D 9/101 (2013.01); F02D 9/1015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909982 A1 20000907; EP 1035312 A2 20000913; EP 1035312 A3 20010307; JP 2000265860 A 20000926

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010908

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI