Global Patent Index - EP 1035320 A2

EP 1035320 A2 2000-09-13 - Method for filling a fuel system for the first time

Title (en)

Method for filling a fuel system for the first time

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erstbefüllung eines Kraftstoffsystems

Title (fr)

Procédé pour remplir un système de carburant pour la première fois

Publication

EP 1035320 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102371 A

Priority

DE 19910331 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves simultaneously actuating at least two control elements (10,12) in the vehicle to initiate operation of the fuel pump (22) to fill the fuel system (26) while the vehicle's engine is not running. The fuel pump is only activated if the ignition is on. The control elements can be the accelerator and brake pedals.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Erstbefüllung eines Kraftstoffsystems bei einem Kraftfahrzeug mit zumindest zwei Bedienelementen sowie einer den Kraftstoff fördernden Kraftstoffpumpe. Zur Vereinfachung der Erstbefüllung wird ein Verfahren vorgeschlagen, bei dem durch gleichzeitiges Betätigen von zumindest zwei im Fahrzeug vorgesehenen Bedienelementen die Kraftstoffpumpe zur Befüllung des Kraftstoffsystems betrieben wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3246658 A1 19840620 - BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035320 A2 20000913; EP 1035320 A3 20010131; EP 1035320 B1 20050112; DE 19910331 A1 20000914; JP 2000265915 A 20000926; US 6371736 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-12-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009181

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009181

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130315

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090204

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090204

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090204

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050423

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-04-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009181 P 20050217

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-01-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030613

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010217

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI