Global patent index - EP 1035329 A2

EP 1035329 A2 2000-09-13 - Turbomachine impeller and its application

Title (en)

Turbomachine impeller and its application

Title (de)

Strömungsmaschinenrad und Verwendung desselben

Title (fr)

Rouet de turbomachine et son application

Publication

EP 1035329 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103933 A

Priority

DE 19910813 A

Abstract (en)

The hub of the shaft has an inner(14) and an outer(16) section with an elastic damping element(26) in between them, and/or elastic blade damping elements(40) provided between the hub outer section and respective blade(22). The hub damping element is annular or sleeve- form and has at least one spring element.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Strömungsmaschinenrad (10) insbesondere für ein Tauchrührwerk oder für eine Abwasser-, Schlamm-, Schmutzwasser- oder Fäkalienpumpe oder für eine Rezirkulationspumpe mit einer Wellennabe (12) beschrieben, die ein Naben-Innenteil (14) und ein Naben-Außenteil (16) aufweist, zwischen welchen ein Naben-Dämpfungselement (26) aus einem elastischen Material vorgesehen ist. Vom Naben-Außenteil (16) stehen Flügelblätter (22) weg. Zwischen dem Naben-Außenteil (16) und dem jeweiligen Flügelblatt (22) sind Flügelblatt-Dämpfungselemente (40) aus elastischem Material vorgesehen. Desgleichen ist es möglich, daß das Strömungsmaschinenrad (10) entweder nur ein Naben-Dämpfungselement (26) oder nur Flügelblatt-Dämpfungselemente (40) aufweist, um durch unkontrollierte hydraulische Bedingungen bzw. Eigenschaften und Anströmungen verursachte Vibrationen bzw. Beschädigungen des Strömungsmaschinenrades bzw. des damit verbundenen Antriebsmotors, des Getriebes, der Halterungen hierfür usw. (10) zumindest zu reduzieren oder zu vermeiden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/22; F04D 29/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 7/04 (2006.01); B01F 7/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/18 (2006.01); F04D 29/20 (2006.01); F04D 29/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/669 (2013.01); F04D 29/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035329 A2 20000913; EP 1035329 A3 20010912; DE 19910813 A1 20000921; DE 19910813 B4 20040715; JP 2000274397 A 20001003; US 6309181 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030121

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 04D 29/22 A, 7F 04D 29/66 B, 7F 04D 29/24 B

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI