Global Patent Index - EP 1035330 A2

EP 1035330 A2 2000-09-13 - Impeller for blower, its manufacturing method, and blower

Title (en)

Impeller for blower, its manufacturing method, and blower

Title (de)

Laufrad für Gebläse, dessen Herstellungsverfahren, und Gebläse

Title (fr)

Rouet pour soufflante, sa méthode de fabrication, et soufflante

Publication

EP 1035330 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00104398 A

Priority

JP 5978899 A

Abstract (en)

An impeller having a large aperture is obtained easily. As a result, the blower is enhanced in performance. Having a hub and vanes projecting from the hub, the vanes have multiple layers, and at least one of the multiple layers has a foamed molded layer. This impeller is used in a blower. This blower is used in an outdoor unit of an air conditioner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/38; F04D 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/32 (2006.01); F04D 29/02 (2006.01); F04D 29/38 (2006.01); F24F 7/007 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/38 (2013.01); F04D 29/023 (2013.01); F04D 29/388 (2013.01); F24F 7/007 (2013.01); F05D 2230/31 (2013.01); F05D 2300/43 (2013.01); F05D 2300/612 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035330 A2 20000913; EP 1035330 A3 20020508; EP 1035330 B1 20041110; CN 1116522 C 20030730; CN 1266150 A 20000913; DE 60015628 D1 20041216; DE 60015628 T2 20051110; ES 2232339 T3 20050601; JP 2000257592 A 20000919; MY 122606 A 20060429

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100303

2011-11-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111121

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090401

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2232339 T3

2004-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60015628 P 20041216

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2003-01-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021115

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020711

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI