Global Patent Index - EP 1035331 A2

EP 1035331 A2 2000-09-13 - Pilot-operated multiway valve

Title (en)

Pilot-operated multiway valve

Title (de)

Vorsteuerbares Wegeventil

Title (fr)

Distributeur piloté

Publication

EP 1035331 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99126259 A

Priority

DE 19909918 A

Abstract (en)

A control chamber(38,40) is provided for each control piston(32,34), and the seating components(18,20) have differently sized valve ports(22,24). To create an externally sealing system whereby the end faces of the seating component facing away from each other interact with the spool(26), the seating component which controls a pressure medium connection between the pressure medium channels(P,A) has the larger valve port and lies adjacent to the control piston(32) with the smaller piston area.

Abstract (de)

Es werden vorsteuerbare Wegeventile (10, 58, 60) vorgeschlagen, die durch ihre Bauweise die Ausbildung von ebenfalls vorsteuerbaren Ventileinheiten (50) erlauben, welche als sitzgesteuerte Impulsventile oder als Umschaltventile in außendichtender bzw. innendichtender Bauform ausführbar sind. Die Wegeventile (10, 58, 60) weisen dazu Sitzkörper (18, 20, 68, 70) mit unterschiedlich großen Ventilöffnungen auf. Ferner sind die Ventilschieber (26, 64) mit Steuerkolben (32, 34, 82, 84) unterschiedlich großer Kolbenflächen ausgestattet, die jeweils in separaten Steuerkammern (38, 40, 96, 100) geführt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/04 (2006.01); F15B 13/042 (2006.01); F15B 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0832 (2013.01); F15B 13/0405 (2013.01); F15B 13/042 (2013.01); F15B 13/0817 (2013.01); F15B 13/0821 (2013.01); F15B 13/085 (2013.01); F15B 13/0857 (2013.01); F15B 13/0875 (2013.01); F15B 2013/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5103866 A 19920414 - FOSTER RAYMOND K [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035331 A2 20000913; EP 1035331 A3 20020529; EP 1035331 B1 20070110; DE 19909918 A1 20000914; DE 59914148 D1 20070222

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59914148

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120703

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2010-12-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-09-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20071011

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070110

2007-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-08-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20070110

2007-03-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2007-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914148

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-02-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2007-01-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 15B 13/042 A, 7F 15B 13/00 B, 7F 16K 11/044 B, 7F 16K 11/048 B, 7F 16K 31/122 B, 7F 15B 13/04 B

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI