Global Patent Index - EP 1035333 A1

EP 1035333 A1 2000-09-13 - Pneumatic rotary and/or linear motion device

Title (en)

Pneumatic rotary and/or linear motion device

Title (de)

Pneumatische Dreh- und/oder Hubvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pneumatique pour le mouvement rotatif et/ou linéaire

Publication

EP 1035333 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00104728 A

Priority

DE 19910196 A

Abstract (en)

The rotating and/or lifting device(2) has a hollow cylindrical or barrel-form body(4), the volume(16) of which is closed off airtight and pressure-tight at its two ends by a cover plate(8a,8b). The wall of the body consists of rubber or comparative elastomer material in which fibres(12) are incorporated at an angle in relation to the longitudinal axis(14). The fibres in the wall are non-stretchable and may be arranged in at least two layers laying one on top of the other. The fibres have the same effective direction.

Abstract (de)

Es soll eine einfache Dreh- und/oder Hubvorrichtung (2) geschaffen werden, die die Merkmale Heben/Senken, Drehen und Dämpfen in sich vereint. Das Volumen (16) eines hohlzylindrischen oder tonnenförmigen Gebildes (4) ist an seinen beiden Enden jeweils durch eine Abdeckplatte (8a, 8b) oder einen Abrollkolben luft- und druckdicht abschließbar. In seine Wandung, die aus Gummi oder einem vergleichbaren Elastomermaterial besteht, sind Fäden (12), die vorzugsweise undehnbar sind, unter einem Winkel ¬= 0, bezogen auf die Längsachse (14), eingearbeitet. Das Volumen (16) kann mit Druckluft (p1) beaufschlagt werden. Die Dreh- und/oder Hubvorrichtung (2) ist überall dort einsetzbar, wo sonst pneumatisch Dreh- oder Dreh-Linearbewegungen über Zylinder eingeleitet bzw. ausgeführt werden. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/103 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IE LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035333 A1 20000913; DE 19910196 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-29 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040807

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031113

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB IE LU

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010313

2000-11-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KASCHUB, DIRK

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE LU

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI