Global Patent Index - EP 1035368 A2

EP 1035368 A2 2000-09-13 - Container for storing cryogenic media

Title (en)

Container for storing cryogenic media

Title (de)

Behälter zur Speicherung kryogener Medien

Title (fr)

Récipient pour le stockage d'agents cryogènes

Publication

EP 1035368 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101055 A

Priority

DE 19909997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19909997C1] The raising device (10) connected to the container (1) for storage of cryogenic media has inflow (13) and outflow (15) ends for removal of medium. The thermo-dynamic vibrations of the raising device are extensively excluded and the heat input into the device and the container is reduced. The outflow end of the raising device when cryogenic medium is not being removed remains in flow connection with the container.

Abstract (de)

Bei Behältern (1) zur Speicherung kryogener Medien mit einem Heber (10) zur Entnahme des gespeicherten Mediums, wobei der Heber (10) ein Einflußende (13) und ein Ausflußende (15) aufweist, werden die thermodynamischen Schwingungen des Hebers (10) weitestgehend ausgeschlossen und der Wärmeeinfall in den Heber (10) und in den Behälter (1) dadurch reduziert, daß das Ausflußende (15) des Hebers (10) bei Nichtentnahme von kryogenem Medium aus dem Behälter (1) in Strömungsverbindung mit dem Behälter (1) steht.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 9/00; F17C 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 3/08 (2006.01); F17C 9/00 (2006.01); F17C 9/02 (2006.01); F17C 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 9/02 (2013.01); F17C 3/08 (2013.01); F17C 9/00 (2013.01); F17C 13/04 (2013.01); F17C 2203/018 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909997 C1 20000810; EP 1035368 A2 20000913; EP 1035368 A3 20080625

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-06-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081230

2009-03-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2008-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2005-03-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI