Global Patent Index - EP 1035372 A2

EP 1035372 A2 2000-09-13 - Casing for a steam generator for electrical household appliances

Title (en)

Casing for a steam generator for electrical household appliances

Title (de)

Dampferzeugergehäuse für elektrische Haushaltsgeräte

Title (fr)

Boîtier d'un générateur de vapeur pour appareils ménagers électriques

Publication

EP 1035372 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00102535 A

Priority

IT PN990007 U

Abstract (en)

Casing adapted in particular as a housing for steam generators for use in conjunction with electrical household appliances, such as steam cleaning appliances, clothes irons either of the simple or the automatic-refill type, fan-assisted ironing boards with refill function, coffee and similar brewing machines. The casing comprises two half-shells, ie. an upper one (1) and a lower one (2), in which the upper half-shell (1) is made of metal and the lower half-shell (2) is made of plastics. The borders (3, 5) of the half-shells are joined together by means of screws (7). The border (3) of the upper half-shell (1) is bent inwards, ie. towards the interior of the casing, and the border (5) of the lower half-shell (2) is so shaped as to feature a series of recessing receptacles (4) for the insertion of the screws (7) needed for joining the half-shells together. The solution is effective in both technically and aesthetically improve the assembly of the two half-shells, while increasing the strength and solidity of the casing and reducing the number of component parts and the assembly time of the same casing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 1/284 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035372 A2 20000913; EP 1035372 A3 20020612; IT 248014 Y1 20021209; IT PN990007 U1 20000911; IT PN990007 V0 19990310

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021213

2003-04-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI