Global Patent Index - EP 1035374 A1

EP 1035374 A1 2000-09-13 - Chimney construction module with mineral wool insulating shell

Title (en)

Chimney construction module with mineral wool insulating shell

Title (de)

Schornsteinaufbau mit Dämmschale aus Mineralwolle

Title (fr)

Element de construction de cheminée avec coque isolante en laine de roche

Publication

EP 1035374 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99110604 A

Priority

DE 19909788 A

Abstract (en)

An exhaust gas pipe (3) runs inside the chimney shaft (2) and is surrounded by an insulating pipe (4) of shape-stabilised mineral wool. A stabilising support pipe (5) of shape-stabilised mineral wool encloses and adjoins the insulating pipe on one side and is supported by at least some of its surface area on the inside walls of the chimney shaft (2). Starting from a circular cross section the support pipe flattens out on at least two opposite outside surfaces to form support faces (9) to adjoin against two opposite inside walls of the chimney shaft.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird ein Schornsteinaufbau (1), bei dem die aus einem Abgasrohr (3) und einem dieses umgebenden Isolierrohres (4) aus Mineralwolle bestehende Einheit mittels eines Stützrohres (5), welches ebenfalls aus formstabilisierter Mineralwolle besteht, gegenüber den Innenwänden des Schornsteinschachtes (2) abgestützt ist. Das Stützrohr (5) umgibt das Isolierrohr (4) im wesentlichen formschlüssig. Das Stützrohr (5) ist ebenfalls aus einem Rohr mit ringförmigem Querschnitt gefertigt, welches an vier um 90° versetzten Seiten angeflacht ist und mit diesen ebenen, angeflachten Flächen (9) an den Innenseiten des Schornsteinschachtes (2) anliegt. Gegenstand der Anmeldung sind auch die einzelnen Bauelemente, insbesondere das Stützrohr (5) und mit ihm gebildete Baugruppen aus Elementen gleicher Länge, die jeweils axial gegeneinander verschoben zu einem Aufbau zusammengefügt werden können, bei dem die Fugen der einzelnen Elemente gegeneinander längenversetzt sind. Die Anordnung eignet sich für nachträglichen Schornsteineinbau, da der Aufbau von innen nach außen erfolgen kann. Die hohlen Ecken 11 stehen zum Einziehen von Leitungen und Kabeln zur Verfügung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23J 13/02; E04F 17/02; F16L 59/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 17/02 (2006.01); F23J 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 17/023 (2013.01); F23J 13/025 (2013.01); F23J 2213/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909788 A1 20000907; EP 1035374 A1 20000913

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030716

2004-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SEITZ, WILFRIED

2004-10-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SEITZ, WILFRIED

2004-09-29 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2004-09-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030715

2004-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SEITZ, WILFRIED

2004-04-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SEITZ, WILFRIED

2002-11-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SEITZ, WILFRIED

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SEITZ, WILFRIED

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE DK FR GB LI SE

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010312

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB LI SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI