Global patent index - EP 1035384 A1

EP 1035384 A1 2000-09-13 - AIR CONDITIONING UNIT

Title (en)

AIR CONDITIONING UNIT

Title (de)

KLIMAANLAGE

Title (fr)

ORGANE DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR

Publication

EP 1035384 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99969783 A

Priority

  • JP 9905307 W
  • JP 27738798 A

Abstract (en)

A digital broadcasting receiver is provided which can reproduce a carrier quickly and capture a desired signal at high speed. A carrier reproduction phase error detection circuit (6) detects a phase error voltage in accordance with a demodulation output obtained by demodulating a demodulated wave of a modulated wave during a predetermined section in a header section. A peak number calculation circuit (92) calculates an error frequency between a desired reception frequency and a reproduction carrier frequency in accordance with the phase error voltage. A differential coefficient calculation circuit (94) calculates the polarity of the error frequency. A step frequency control circuit (96) converts the calculated error frequency having the calculated polarity into a step frequency width for automatic frequency control. The reproduction carrier frequency is scanned at the converted step frequency width until a frame sync is established after the frame sync is detected. It is therefore possible to reproduce the carrier quickly and capture the desired signal at high speed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/20 (2006.01); F24F 13/22 (2006.01); F24F 13/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/0059 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035384 A1 20000913; EP 1035384 A4 20011219; EP 1035384 B1 20051130; AU 5997699 A 20000417; AU 733859 B2 20010531; CN 1148536 C 20040505; CN 1275191 A 20001129; CN 2397414 Y 20000920; DE 69928639 D1 20060105; DE 69928639 T2 20060810; ES 2251259 T3 20060416; JP 2000104943 A 20000411; JP 3052942 B2 20000619; WO 0019150 A1 20000406

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130929

2014-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69928639

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130929

2014-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2013-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130606

2013-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120912

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110929

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100920

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100923

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1030256

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2006-11-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2251259

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69928639

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-01-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2005-11-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040305

2001-12-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20011106

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Ref Legal Event Code: K1C1

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE