Global Patent Index - EP 1035392 A2

EP 1035392 A2 2000-09-13 - Shaft furnace operating method

Title (en)

Shaft furnace operating method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Schachtofens

Title (fr)

Méthode por opérer un four à cuve

Publication

EP 1035392 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104380 A

Priority

DE 19909742 A

Abstract (en)

Metal-producing shaft furnace operation comprises oxygen and coal dust supply through burners with annular outlets arranged concentrically about a central outlet. A method of operating a metal-producing shaft furnace comprises continuously or periodically filling the shaft with a charge, withdrawing melt the shaft bottom and supplying the shaft, especially in its lower region, with oxygen or oxygen-containing gas and coal dust or coal dust-containing material through one or more burners (especially high velocity burners), having annular outlet opening regions arranged concentrically about a central outlet opening, and/or one or more oxygen lances fitted with the burner. Preferred Features: The coal dust or coal dust-containing material is supplied through the central opening.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Schachtofens, insbesondere eines Kupolofens, zur Erzeugung von Metallen, insbesondere von Gußeisen, und Metalllegierungen, bei dem der Ofenschacht mit einem entsprechenden Einsatz befüllt ist bzw. andauernd oder periodisch befüllt und bodenseitig die Gußeisenschmelze entnommen wird, wobei dem Ofenschacht, insbesondere in seinem unteren Bereich, Sauerstoff oder ein Sauerstoffhaltiges Gasgemisch sowie Kohlenstaub oder ein Kohlenstaub-haltiges Material zugeführt wird. Erfindungsgemäß erfolgt die Zuführung mittels wenigstens eines Brenners, vorzugsweise eines Hochgeschwindigkeitsbrenners, mit einer zentralen Austrittsöffnung und konzentrisch um die zentrale Austrittsöffnung angeordnete, im wesentlichen ringförmige Austrittsöffnungsbereiche und/oder mittels wenigstens einer Lanze mit wenigstens einem derartigen aufgesetzten Brenner. Hierbei wird der Kohlenstaub oder das Kohlenstaub-haltige Material vorzugsweise über die zentrale Austrittsöffnung in den Schachtofen geführt. Eine vorgeschaltete Erwärmung des dem Ofen zugeführten Sauerstoffes oder Sauerstoff-haltigen Gasgemisches erübrigt sich. Ein Zusetzen des Brenners bzw. der Düsen kann wirkungsvoll verhindert werden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 1/20; C21C 5/46; F23D 14/22; F27B 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 5/00 (2006.01); C21C 1/08 (2006.01); F27B 1/16 (2006.01); F27D 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 99/0033 (2013.01); C21B 5/003 (2013.01); C21C 1/08 (2013.01); F27B 1/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909742 A1 20000907; EP 1035392 A2 20000913; EP 1035392 A3 20021211

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020512

2003-10-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 27B 1/20 A, 7F 27B 1/16 B, 7F 23D 14/22 B, 7C 21C 5/46 B, 7F 27B 1/10 B, 7C 21B 5/00 B, 7C 21B 11/02 B, 7F 23D 1/00 B

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE AG

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE GAS AG

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI