Global Patent Index - EP 1035433 A1

EP 1035433 A1 2000-09-13 - Method for replenishing a color photographic developer

Title (en)

Method for replenishing a color photographic developer

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Nachfüllung eines farbphotographischen Entwicklers

Title (fr)

Procédé pour renouveler un révélateur photographique chromogène

Publication

EP 1035433 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00420030 A

Priority

FR 9902974 A

Abstract (en)

A method for replenishing a color developer containing an antifoggant, the color developer being used intermittently, which comprises adding to the color developer an amount of antifoggant that is not dependent on the intermittent use of the color developer and wherein the antifoggant has the following formula (I) <CHEM> wherein X is -COOM or -SO3M with M being hydrogen, an alkali metal or ammonium ion, R is an alkyl group with 1 to 3 atoms of carbon, and n is 0, 1, 2 or 3.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/407 (2006.01); G03C 7/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035433 A1 20000913; FR 2790841 A1 20000915; FR 2790841 B1 20031107; JP 2000267240 A 20000929

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040316

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031103

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI