Global patent index - EP 1035434 A2

EP 1035434 A2 2000-09-13 - Photomask with unresolved auxiliary patterns

Title (en)

Photomask with unresolved auxiliary patterns

Title (de)

Photomaske mit nicht aufgelösten Hilfsmustern

Title (fr)

Masque pour photolithographie avec motifs auxiliaires à dimensions en-dessous de la limite de résolution

Publication

EP 1035434 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00103583 A

Priority

US 26647399 A

Abstract (en)

A pattern for a mask used in lithographic processing, in accordance with the invention, includes a plurality of elongated structures disposed substantially parallel to each other on a substrate and a plurality of sub-resolution extrusions extending transversely from the elongated structures into spaces between the elongated structures, the plurality of extrusions having a substantially same size in a direction parallel to the elongated structures, the plurality of extrusions being spaced apart periodically in the direction parallel to the elongated structures, the elongated structures and extrusions being formed from an energy absorbent material. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03F 1/14; G03F 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 1/00 (2012.01); H01L 21/027 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03F 1/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035434 A2 20000913; EP 1035434 A3 20010418; CN 1267083 A 20000920; JP 2000284466 A 20001013; TW 440906 B 20010616; US 6114074 A 20000905

INPADOC legal status

2008-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080118

2007-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070907

2004-01-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010703

2002-01-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT NL

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT NL

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI