Global Patent Index - EP 1035451 A2

EP 1035451 A2 2000-09-13 - Intermediate transfer blanket and method of producing the same

Title (en)

Intermediate transfer blanket and method of producing the same

Title (de)

Zwischenübertragungselement und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Elément de transfert intermédiaire et sa méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 1035451 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00201811 A

Priority

EP 97924224 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1028358A2] A method of producing a coating on a member comprising: providing a body portion; coating the body portion with a catalyst material for a release coating material; and overcoating the catalyst material with an umcured polymer material for which the catalyst is active. Preferably, the release coating material is a condensation type silicone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/162 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028358 A2 20000816; EP 1028358 A3 20001018; EP 1028358 B1 20030910; DE 69724839 D1 20031016; DE 69724839 T2 20040708; EP 1035451 A2 20000913; EP 1035451 A3 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1040125

2005-12-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050611

2003-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD INDIGO B.V.

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020610

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 986778

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT