Global patent index - EP 1035453 A1

EP 1035453 A1 2000-09-13 - Dial comprising brilliants, applied ornaments or other attached elements and process for fixing such elements onto such a dial

Title (en)

Dial comprising brilliants, applied ornaments or other attached elements and process for fixing such elements onto such a dial

Title (de)

Zifferblatt für Uhren mit Brillanten, Auflegestücken oder anderen eingesetzen Elementen und Verfahren zur Befestigung dieser Elemente an einem solchen Zifferblatt

Title (fr)

Cadran comportant des brillants, appliques ou autres éléments rapportés et procédé de fixation de ces éléments sur un tel cadran

Publication

EP 1035453 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99104416 A

Priority

EP 99104416 A

Abstract (en)

The system uses stamped holes in the dial to ensure accurate alignment of markers on the face. The dial (1) for a clock or watch comprises a plate in which a number of apertures (6) are provided. Each aperture is intended to receive a decorative element (8). The apertures each have a base defined by an adhesive ribbon (16) whose adhesive surfaces makes contact with the decorative element. The adhesive ribbon is glued to the reverse side of the dial over an area which is larger than that of the aperture. The adhesive tape may be of the order of 50 micro-meters thick, and may also be adhesive on both sides. The apertures in the dial may be formed by stamping the sheet material.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un cadran (1), notamment pour pièce d'horlogerie, comprenant une plaque présentant au moins un dégagement définissant un logement (6) dans lequel est fixé un élément décoratif (8) ou analogue, caractérisé en ce que le logement (6) comprend un fond (14) formé d'un ruban adhésif (16) dont la face adhésive vient en contact avec l'élément décoratif (8). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04D 3/00; G04B 19/10; G04B 47/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/10 (2006.01); G04B 47/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/10 (2013.01); G04B 47/042 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

CH 260123 A 19490228 - BEYELER & CIE G [CH]

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9905233 A1 19990204 - CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP], et al
  • [A] CH 33104 A 19051031 - ARNOULD JULES [CH]
  • [A] DE 1943075 A1 19710304 - UEBELHARDT ROGER
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 097, no. 009 30 September 1997 (1997-09-30)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 485 (M - 887) 6 November 1989 (1989-11-06)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 180 (P - 215) 9 August 1983 (1983-08-09)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 033 (P - 254) 14 February 1984 (1984-02-14)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035453 A1 20000913; EP 1035453 B1 20040602; DE 69917744 D1 20040708; DE 69917744 T2 20050707

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110305

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100305

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100305

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100312

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050303

2004-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2004-09-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69917744

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ETA SA MANUFACTURE HORLOGERE SUISSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010313

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI