Global Patent Index - EP 1035458 A1

EP 1035458 A1 2000-09-13 - Hydraulic feedback device with meter-out control

Title (en)

Hydraulic feedback device with meter-out control

Title (de)

Hydraulisches Regelgerät mit Ablaufsteuerung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle hydraulique avec commande en secondaire

Publication

EP 1035458 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810205 A

Priority

EP 99810205 A

Abstract (en)

The regulator consists of a control piston (2) with a control edge (4) and a control bush (3). The control edge of the control piston is arranged on the end of the piston guided in the control bush and is formed by a chamfer extending over the periphery of the control bush

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Regelgerät (1) mit einer Ablaufsteuerung, wobei der Steuerkolben (2) des Regelgeräts (1), welcher in einer Steuerbüchse (3) geführt ist, mit einer Steuerkante (4) ausgestattet ist, welche durch eine Abschrägung über den Umfang zur Steuerbüchse (3) hin ausgebildet ist. Durch diese Anordnung der Steuerkante (4) wird eine reibungsfreie Führung des Steuerkolbens (2) in der Steuerbüchse (3) erreicht. Vorteilhaft wird die Regelgüte erhöht, da die Steuerbüchse (3) nicht mehr mitgezogen werden bzw. nicht mehr gestossen werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05D 16/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/028 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/028 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30525 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50536 (2013.01); F15B 2211/528 (2013.01); F15B 2211/635 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6653 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9732136 A1 19970904 - BERINGER HYDRAULIK AG [CH], et al
  • [A] DE 4426152 A1 19960328 - ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]
  • [X] GÖTZ, WERNER: "Elektrohydraulische Proportional- und Regelungstechnik in Theorie und Praxis", 1989, ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, STUTTGART, DE, XP002111423

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035458 A1 20000913; EP 1035458 B1 20031126; DE 59907859 D1 20040108

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59907859

2016-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59907859

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59907859

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-01-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2004-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907859 P 20040108

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010117

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI