Global Patent Index - EP 1035505 A2

EP 1035505 A2 2000-09-13 - Electronic business card

Title (en)

Electronic business card

Title (de)

Elektronische Visitenkarte

Title (fr)

Carte de visite électronique

Publication

EP 1035505 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104217 A

Priority

DE 19910455 A

Abstract (en)

The data carrier includes a non-volatile storage region (5,10,15) for storing data relating to an individual user, in the style and scope of a visiting card. The data may include just a name, or also a job position and address of the user. The storage region may include an electronic memory chip (10), a magnetic strip (5), or a bar-code (15). An Independent claim is included for a telecommunications terminal with a card reader.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Datenträger (1), insbesondere im Kreditkartenformat, vorgeschlagen der als Visitenkarte dient. Der Datenträger (1) weist einen vorzugsweise nichtflüchtigen Speicherbereich (5, 10, 15) auf. Im Speicherbereich (5, 10, 15) sind Daten über genau einen Benutzer in der Art und im Umfang einer Visitenkarte gespeichert. Es wird außerdem ein elektrisches Gerät (20) vorgeschlagen, insbesondere ein Telekommunikationsendgerät, das zum Lesen eines solchen Datenträgers (1) dient. Das elektrische Gerät (30) umfaßt eine Datenträgerlesevorrichtung (20), insbesondere einen Kartenleser. Das elektrische Gerät (30) umfaßt weiterhin eine Auswerteeinheit (25), die einen in die Datenträgerlesevorrichtung (20) eingelegten Datenträger (1) mit einem Speicherbereich (5, 10, 15), der Daten über genau einen Benutzer in der Art und im Umfang einer Visitenkarte beinhaltet, erkennt und zumindest einen Teil der Daten des erkannten Datenträgers (1), vorzugsweise unter Verwendung eines bei der Speicherung im Speicherbereich (5, 10, 15) des Datenträgers (1) verwendeten Formats (65), einer Weiterverarbeitung zuführt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 19/10; G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/02 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00007 (2013.01); B42D 15/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035505 A2 20000913; EP 1035505 A3 20020102; DE 19910455 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020618

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06K 19/10 A, 7G 07C 9/00 B, 7G 06K 19/07 B, 7G 06F 17/60 B, 7B 42D 15/02 B, 7B 42D 15/10 B

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI