Global patent index - EP 1035513 A2

EP 1035513 A2 2000-09-13 - Security module with status signalization

Title (en)

Security module with status signalization

Title (de)

Sicherheitsmodul mit Statussignalisierung

Title (fr)

Module de sécurité avec signalisation de l'état

Publication

EP 1035513 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250057 A

Priority

  • DE 29905219 U
  • US 52411800 A

Abstract (en)

Sealing compound (105) encases at least part of the printed circuit board (106), which surrounds electrically connected function units. For signaling of the module condition, an optical or acoustic signal device (107,108) is connected to a function unit connected to the printed circuit board (106) which is surrounded by sealing material.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Sicherheitsmodul mit Statussignalisierung, mit einer Batterie und Funktionseinheiten, welche miteinander verschaltet und von einer Vergußmasse bedeckt sind. Eine Batterie (134) ist auswechselbar auf dem Sicherheitsmodul (100) angeordnet, wobei die Vergußmasse (105) einen ersten Teil der Leiterplatte (106) umgibt, während ein zweiter Teil der Leiterplatte (106) für die auswechselbar angeordnete Batterie (134) von Vergußmasse frei bleibt. Zur Signalisierung des Modulzustandes ist ein optisches oder akustisches Signalmittel (107, 108) an der Leiterplatte (106) angeschlossen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00; G07B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00233 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00241 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00967 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29905219 U1 19990617; CN 1151474 C 20040526; CN 1267041 A 20000920; EP 1035513 A2 20000913; EP 1035513 A3 20001220; EP 1035513 B1 20080702; US 6771179 B1 20040803

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50015228

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150330

2009-06-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090403

2008-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50015228

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-08-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2008-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2008-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: POST, PETER

2008-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROSENAU, DIRK

2008-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHLAAFF, TORSTEN

2008-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WAGNER, ANDREAS

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061012

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI