Global Patent Index - EP 1035513 A3

EP 1035513 A3 2000-12-20 - Security module with status signalization

Title (en)

Security module with status signalization

Title (de)

Sicherheitsmodul mit Statussignalisierung

Title (fr)

Module de sécurité avec signalisation de l'état

Publication

EP 1035513 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00250057 A

Priority

  • DE 29905219 U
  • US 52411800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1035513A2] Sealing compound (105) encases at least part of the printed circuit board (106), which surrounds electrically connected function units. For signaling of the module condition, an optical or acoustic signal device (107,108) is connected to a function unit connected to the printed circuit board (106) which is surrounded by sealing material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00; G07B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00233 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00241 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00967 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29905219 U1 19990617; CN 1151474 C 20040526; CN 1267041 A 20000920; EP 1035513 A2 20000913; EP 1035513 A3 20001220; EP 1035513 B1 20080702; US 6771179 B1 20040803

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, 16547 BIRKENWERDER, DE

- Document: DE 50015228

- Effective date: 20150330

2009-06-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090403

2008-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015228 P 20080814

2008-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2008-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POST, PETER

2008-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROSENAU, DIRK

2008-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHLAAFF, TORSTEN

2008-07-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAGNER, ANDREAS

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061012

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI