Global Patent Index - EP 1035515 A2

EP 1035515 A2 2000-09-13 - Postal stamp and method of vertying the validity thereof

Title (en)

Postal stamp and method of vertying the validity thereof

Title (de)

Briefmarke und Methode zum Überprüfen ihrer Gültigkeit

Title (fr)

Timbre postal et procédé pour vérifier sa validation

Publication

EP 1035515 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00104519 A

Priority

US 26630499 A

Abstract (en)

A method of verifying the validity of a postal stamp to determine whether the stamp is produced legitimately and whether it has been canceled in a previous use. The method includes the steps of producing a special code on the stamp of interest and creating a record relating to the special code in a database. When the mailpiece collected by a post office has a stamp bearing a special code, the special code is reported to the database for verification. If the records in the database indicate that the reported special code does exist, then the stamp is considered legitimate. The mailpiece is accepted and the stamp is canceled before delivery, and a request is sent to the database to effect the alteration of the record relating to the "canceled" special code. An altered record will no longer provide a proof of validity if the database is later consulted with respect to the specific special code. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00435 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00443 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0058 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00709 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035515 A2 20000913; EP 1035515 A3 20001220; CA 2300621 A1 20000911

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070710

2007-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070226

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010615

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 07B 17/00 A

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SASONE, RONALD P.

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AUSLANDER, JUDITH A.

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI