Global Patent Index - EP 1035517 A3

EP 1035517 A3 2000-12-20 - Method for the protection of a security module and arrangement for implementing said method

Title (en)

Method for the protection of a security module and arrangement for implementing said method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Schutz eines Sicherheitsmoduls und Anordnung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de protection d'un module de sécurité et ensemble pour mettre en oeuvre ledit procédé

Publication

EP 1035517 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00250064 A

Priority

DE 19912781 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1035517A2] The method involves monitoring the installation of the module using a microprocessor (120) , a monitoring unit (12) and a detection unit (13). The monitoring unit erases sensitive data after improper use or exchange. The functionality of the security module is locked using the exchange of the module. The previously erased sensitive data are re-initialized by the microprocessor after appropriate use or exchange of the security module. The module is restarted after restoring the functional units. An Independent claim is included for an apparatus for carrying out the method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00; G07B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00733 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00233 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00298 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00306 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00346 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00403 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00967 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035517 A2 20000913; EP 1035517 A3 20001220; EP 1035517 B1 20080820; AU 2081100 A 20000914; CN 1156801 C 20040707; CN 1276579 A 20001213; DE 19912781 A1 20001123; DE 50015314 D1 20081002; US 6952777 B1 20051004

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50015314

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150330

2009-07-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090525

2008-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50015314

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-10-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2008-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2008-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060926

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 07B 17/00 A, 7G 07B 17/04 B

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI