Global patent index - EP 1035523 A2

EP 1035523 A2 2000-09-13 - Refunding-lock for transport trolley

Title (en)

Refunding-lock for transport trolley

Title (de)

Pfandschloss für Transportwagen

Title (fr)

Serrure de consigne pour chariot de transport

Publication

EP 1035523 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100526 A

Priority

DE 19911013 A

Abstract (en)

A coin (5) is inserted into the lock and operates an actuator (3,4) which causes the coin to be displaced transverse to its insertion direction. The coin is then locked so that it cannot be withdrawn. Two actuators (3,4) may be provided to interlock when a coin of too small a diameter is inserted. One actuator (3) is a pivotable lever and the other is a displacement spring (4).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Pfandschloß für Transportwagen zum aneinanderschließen von in einer Parkkolonne stehenden Wagen, wobei die Freigabe durch Eingabe einer Pfandmarke erfolgt, die ihrerseits im Pfandschloß verriegelt bleibt, bis der Wagen wieder angekoppelt wird. Wesentlich dabei ist, daß die Pfandmarke beim Einstecken in das Pfandschloß durch ihre Betätigung von im Pfandschloß angeordneten Steligliedern eine zusätzliche Verschiebung quer zur Einsteckrichtung erfährt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/0654 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035523 A2 20000913; EP 1035523 A3 20030507; EP 1035523 B1 20070103; AT 350736 T 20070115; BR 0001276 A 20001031; BR 0001276 B1 20130820; CN 1155923 C 20040630; CN 1267045 A 20000920; DE 19911013 A1 20000914; DE 50013915 D1 20070215; DK 1035523 T3 20070507; ES 2280153 T3 20070916; PL 195649 B1 20071031; PL 338970 A1 20000925; PT 1035523 E 20070430

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160111

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070112

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *SONNENDORFER HORST

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *WIETH FRANZLINDBERGHSTRASSE 8, D-82178 PUCHHEIM

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: LINDBERGHSTRASSE 8, D-82178 (DE)

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *SONNENDORFER HORST

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *WIETH FRANZ

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20071005

2007-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2280153

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-07-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-05-23 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20070401081

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2007-05-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2007-05-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SONNENDORFER, HORST EN WIETH, FRANZ

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20070329

2007-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-04-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2007-02-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SONNENDORFER, HORST

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2007-02-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WIETH, FRANZ

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2007-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50013915

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-01-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050602

2004-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI