Global Patent Index - EP 1035550 A2

EP 1035550 A2 2000-09-13 - Ceramic resistor

Title (en)

Ceramic resistor

Title (de)

Keramischer elektrischer Widerstand

Title (fr)

Résistance en céramique

Publication

EP 1035550 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103135 A

Priority

DE 19910447 A

Abstract (en)

With the use of first filler, an intergranular carbon network is produced, and modified by a further component, by means of which the overall specific electrical resistance is adjusted.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein keramischer elektrischer Widerstand vorgeschlagen, der durch Keramisieren mindestens eines siliciumorganischen Polymers, insbesondere eines Polysiloxans, und mindestens zweier Füllstoffkomponenten hergestellt wird, dessen spezifischer elektrischer Widerstand durch ein durch eine erste Füllstoffkomponente erzeugtes und durch eine weitere Komponente modifiziertes perkolatives Netzwerk eingestellt wird. Die erste Füllstoffkomponente hat vorzugsweise einen Füllstoffanteil zwischen 10 und 60 Vol-% und die zweite Füllstoffkomponente einen Füllstoffanteil unter 25 Vol-%, jeweils bezogen auf die Polymer- Füllstoff- Mischung. Da dieser Widerstand eine geringe Temperaturabhängigkeit im Temperaturbereich von 0 bis 1000 Grad Celsius aufweist und hochspannungsfest ist, eignet er sich als Widerstandselement in einer Zündkerze. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/00 (2006.01); C08K 3/22 (2006.01); C08K 3/34 (2006.01); C08L 83/04 (2006.01); H01C 7/00 (2006.01); H01T 13/41 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 13/41 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035550 A2 20000913; EP 1035550 A3 20030917; DE 19910447 A1 20000914; JP 2000290069 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050226

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040518

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI