Global patent index - EP 1035617 A1

EP 1035617 A1 2000-09-13 - Connecting element

Title (en)

Connecting element

Title (de)

Verbindungselement

Title (fr)

Elément de connexion

Publication

EP 1035617 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00104274 A

Priority

DE 19910572 A

Abstract (en)

The connecting element has an upper part (16) and a lower part (18), each with a clamping surface (20), that can be combined together with facing clamping surfaces, so that when the upper and lower parts are connected, overlapping leads (10) with their contact areas (11) facing each other are clamped between the clamping surfaces. An Independent claim is also included for a method of replacing electrical components, esp. for motor vehicles.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verbindungselement zum Verbinden von insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge vorgesehenen elektrischen Leitungen, die jeweils mehrere mit einem gemeinsamen streifenförmigen Träger verbundene parallele Einzelleiter umfassen, mit einem Oberteil und einem Unterteil, die jeweils zumindest eine Klemmfläche aufweisen und mit einander zugewandten Klemmflächen derart zusammensetzbar sind, daß im verbundenen Zustand zwei mit einander zugewandten Kontaktbereichen überlappende Leitungen zwischen den Klemmflächen eingeklemmt sind. Die Erfindung betrifft außerdem ein Verfahren zum Austauschen von insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge vorgesehenen elektrischen Bauteilen mit Hilfe eines erfindungsgemäßen Verbindungselementes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 16/02 (2006.01); H01R 12/61 (2011.01); H05K 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/61 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035617 A1 20000913; EP 1035617 B1 20070725; DE 19910572 A1 20000914; DE 50014502 D1 20070906; ES 2286963 T3 20071216; US 6383004 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110302

2012-04-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120424

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50014502

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110301

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100312

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100408

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080428

2007-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2286963

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50014502

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-09-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-08-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070725

2007-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-07-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010302

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI