Global Patent Index - EP 1035619 A1

EP 1035619 A1 2000-09-13 - Electrical Connector

Title (en)

Electrical Connector

Title (de)

Stecker

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 1035619 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103904 A

Priority

DE 29904053 U

Abstract (en)

The plug (1) consists of at least one body (5) with an axial drill hole (4), at whose first end (3) a cable (6) is inserted. The cable is connectable with contact elements (7) arranged at the second end (2) of the plug body. The first end is associated with a pull-relief arrangement (10) comprising at least two clamping elements (8, 9) stored adjustable for clamping the cable. The plug body comprises at least two slider guides (11,12) proceeding in direction of the axial drill hole, in which the clamping elements are led adjustable.

Abstract (de)

Ein Stecker weist wenigstens einen eine Axialbohrung aufweisenden Steckerkörper auf, an dessen erstem Ende ein Kabel in den Steckerkörper einführbar und mit am zweiten Ende angeordneten elektrischen Kontaktelementen verbindbar ist, wobei dem ersten Ende eine zumindest zwei zum Einklemmen des Kabels verstellbar gelagerte Klemmelemente aufweisende Zugentlastungseinrichtung zugeordnet ist. Um unter Beibehaltung bekannter Vorzüge der Zugentlastungseinrichtung den Stecker noch einfacher und kostengünstiger aufzubauen und gleichzeitig die Zugänglichkeit zur Zugentlastungseinrichtung zu verbessern, weist der Steckerkörper wenigstens zwei in Richtung der Axialbohrung und nach außen offene Gleitführungen auf, in denen die Klemmelemente verschiebbar geführt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/595; H01R 13/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 13/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5205 (2013.01); H01R 13/5816 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29904053 U1 20000713; AT 251811 T 20031015; AU 2060800 A 20000928; AU 742298 B2 20011220; EP 1035619 A1 20000913; EP 1035619 B1 20031008; US 6368145 B1 20020409; ZA 200001106 B 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170209

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170207

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: VIA LUGANETTO 3, 6962 LUGANO (CH)

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070224

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040308

2007-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2006-02-23 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20060223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-01 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20060201

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: COOPER CROUSE-HINDS GMBH

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-09-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: COOPER CROUSE-HINDS GMBH

- Free text: CEAG SICHERHEITSTECHNIK GMBH#SENATOR-SCHWARTZ-RING 26#59494 SOEST (DE) -TRANSFER TO- COOPER CROUSE-HINDS GMBH#SENATOR-SCHWARTZ-RING 26#59494 SOEST (DE)

2004-01-26 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20040126

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-01-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040119

2004-01-12 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040112

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-01-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040108

2004-01-08 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040108

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003961 P 20031113

2003-11-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: JACOBACCI & PARTNERS S.P.A.

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-08 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-10-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-10-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021115

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI