Global Patent Index - EP 1035674 A2

EP 1035674 A2 2000-09-13 - Method and apparatus for receiving Digital Audio Broadcast (DAB)

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for receiving Digital Audio Broadcast (DAB)

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung für den Empfang vom digitalen Hörfunk DAB

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour la réception de la radiodiffusion numérique DAB

Publication

EP 1035674 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00104709 A

Priority

JP 6470199 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a digital audio broadcast receiver (1) for searching text data included in a digital audio broadcast signal for an HTTP address and acquiring HTML data at that address in the Internet (3). The invention further relates to a broadcast receiver (1) for searching data added to a broadcast signal for an address and acquiring data at that address in a computer network. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/00 (2006.01); H04B 1/16 (2006.01); H04H 20/00 (2008.01); H04H 20/93 (2008.01); H04H 60/37 (2008.01); H04H 60/82 (2008.01); H04L 12/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/93 (2013.01); H04H 60/37 (2013.01); H04H 60/82 (2013.01); H04H 2201/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035674 A2 20000913; EP 1035674 A3 20011212; JP 2000261390 A 20000922

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20021008

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020418

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI