Global patent index - EP 1035745 A1

EP 1035745 A1 2000-09-13 - Random access burst transmission scheme

Title (en)

Random access burst transmission scheme

Title (de)

Übertragungsverfahren für ein Zufallszugriffsburst

Title (fr)

Procédé de transmission d'un salve d'accès aléatoire

Publication

EP 1035745 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99104766 A

Priority

EP 99104766 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to an apparatus for transmitting and receiving signals in a wireless telecommunication system and to a method for transmitting random access bursts in such an apparatus. The apparatus 1 comprises transmitting means 3 for transmitting random access bursts, receiving means 4 for receiving acknowledgement information confirming a successful transmission of a random access burst, decision means for deciding if acknowledgement information has been received, and control means 6 for randomly choosing a time point for an attempt to retransmit said random access burst from an interval if no acknowledgement information has been received after a random access burst had been transmitted, whereby the control means sets the length of the interval depending on the number of unsuccessful attempts to transmit a random access burst. The proposed backoff scheme provides an improved performance and increased system stability without the need for a collision detection on the network side. Further, the proposed backoff scheme supports different priority classes for the transmission of random access bursts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 74/00 (2009.01); H04W 74/08 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 74/085 (2013.01); H04L 1/188 (2013.01); H04W 74/0875 (2013.01); H04W 28/04 (2013.01); H04W 72/10 (2013.01); H04W 74/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] EP 0339740 A2 19891102 - PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035745 A1 20000913; EP 1035745 B1 20050511; DE 69925238 D1 20050616; DE 69925238 T2 20060223; EP 1511346 A2 20050302; EP 1511346 A3 20051228; JP 2000308148 A 20001102; JP 2008148362 A 20080626; JP 4342683 B2 20091014; JP 4343250 B2 20091014; US 2003114113 A1 20030619; US 2008019311 A1 20080124; US 2011122850 A1 20110526; US 2012087308 A1 20120412; US 2013044689 A1 20130221; US 7359705 B2 20080415; US 7899404 B2 20110301; US 8320305 B2 20121127; US 9426831 B2 20160823

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20150407

2013-10-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69925238

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-10-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69925238

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-10-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69925238

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH, PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, PART, DE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-10-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69925238

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH, PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTM, DE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69925238

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MITSCHERLICH & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAE, DE

2006-05-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2006-05-19 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-04-14 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2006-04-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-02-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-12-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-10-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69925238

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE

2005-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONY INTERNATIONAL (EUROPE) GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR GB IT SE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010115

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI